Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Plotti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1932BornBologna
25 Jul 195926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Dec 198048.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Dec 198048.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vannida
6 Jan 198148.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vannida
7 Jun 198653.8AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
17 Jun 198653.8InstalledArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
2 Feb 200875.4RetiredArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
19 May 201279.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trapani, Italy
3 Nov 201381.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Trapani, Italy
19 Oct 201583.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Plotti:
Archbishop Alessandro Plotti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pisa

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • d: CB, 19 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015