Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Louis Joseph Vandame, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of N’Djaména, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1928 Born
7 Sep 196032.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 May 198152.9AppointedArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad
6 Jan 198253.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad
31 Jul 200375.1RetiredArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad

MicroData Summary for Charles Louis Joseph Vandame
Archbishop Charles Louis Joseph Vandame S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of N’Djaména

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColombes, France

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of N’Djaména.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018