Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Pezzuto

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Archbishop of Turris in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1946 Born
25 Sep 197125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lecce, Italy
7 Dec 199650.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Turris in Proconsulari
7 Dec 199650.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
7 Dec 199650.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gabon
6 Jan 199750.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Turris in Proconsulari
22 May 199953.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tanzania
2 Apr 200558.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
7 May 200559.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belize, Antilles
17 Nov 201266.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia and Herzegovina
17 Nov 201266.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Montenegro
16 Jan 201669.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Monaco
25 May 201973.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Monaco
31 Aug 202175.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia and Herzegovina
31 Aug 202175.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pezzuto
Archbishop Luigi Pezzuto (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Bosnia and Herzegovina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSquinzano, Diocese of Lecce, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Bosnia and Herzegovina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,873
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 25 May 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2021
  • opd/c1: CB, 2 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast