Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Joaquim Zico, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1927BornLuz
22 Oct 195023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Dec 198053.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
6 Jan 198153.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
4 Jul 199063.4SucceededArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
13 Oct 200477.7RetiredArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
4 May 201588.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente Joaquim Zico:
Archbishop Vicente Joaquim Zico C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015