Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Guido Ottonello

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Slovakia

Titular Archbishop of Sasabe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1946 Born
29 Jun 197124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
29 Nov 199953.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sasabe
29 Nov 199953.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
6 Jan 200053.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sasabe
26 Feb 200558.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
1 Apr 201770.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovakia
31 Oct 202175.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Guido Ottonello
(VIAF: 88825083; WikiData: Q1522114)
Archbishop Giacomo Guido Ottonello (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Slovakia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasone, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Slovakia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,660
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2021
  • opd: CB, 6 Nov 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 7 Jan 2024