Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Louis Fitzgerald, M. Afr.

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Nepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1937 BornWalsall, Great Britain
3 Feb 196123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
22 Jan 198749.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
16 Dec 199154.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
6 Jan 199254.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte
1 Oct 200265.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nepte
1 Oct 200265.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
2 Apr 200567.6CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
21 Apr 200567.7ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
15 Feb 200668.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
23 Oct 201275.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Michael Louis Fitzgerald:
Archbishop Michael Louis Fitzgerald M. Afr. (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Egypt, Arab Republic of

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Egypt, Arab Republic of.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,562
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013