Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petar 覚lic

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska

Titular Bishop of Mauriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1948BornNeoric
7 Jul 197426.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 199143.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
14 Dec 199143.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauriana
6 Jan 199243.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauriana
6 Dec 199244.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Petar 覚lic:
Bishop Petar 覚lic (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,561
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013