Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Myroslav Ivan Cardinal Lubachivsky

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sofia a Via Boccea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1914BornDolyna, Ukraine
21 Sep 193824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Sep 197965.2AppointedBishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
12 Nov 197965.4Ordained BishopBishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
27 Mar 198065.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
7 Sep 198470.2SucceededArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 May 198570.9Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198570.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sofia a Via Boccea
14 Dec 200086.5DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Myroslav Ivan Lubachivsky:
Myroslav Ivan Cardinal Lubachivsky (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014