Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albin Małysiak, C.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

Titular Bishop of Beatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1917BornKocoń
1 May 194123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
14 Jan 197052.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Jan 197052.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Beatia
5 Apr 197052.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beatia
27 Feb 199375.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
16 Jul 201194.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Albin Małysiak:
Bishop Albin Małysiak C.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 848
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,823
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013