Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Pérez González

Archbishop of Pamplona y Tudela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1947 BornFrandovínez
21 Jul 197326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
16 Dec 199548.9AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
6 Jan 199649.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
30 Oct 200356.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Spain, Military
31 Jul 200760.5AppointedArchbishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pérez González:
Archbishop Francisco Pérez González (born ) Archbishop of Pamplona y Tudela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013