Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Komarica

Bishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1946 Born
29 Jun 197226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
28 Oct 198539.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
28 Oct 198539.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafis
6 Jan 198639.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafis
15 May 198943.2AppointedBishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Franjo Komarica
Bishop Franjo Komarica (born ) Bishop of Banja Luka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovakovici

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banja Luka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast