Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alan Basil de Lastic

Deceased

Archbishop of Delhi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1929BornMaymyo, Myanmar
21 Dec 195829.2Ordained PriestPriest of Calcutta, India
9 Apr 197949.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calcutta, India
9 Apr 197949.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
27 May 197949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
2 Jul 198454.8AppointedBishop of Lucknow, India
19 Nov 199061.2AppointedArchbishop of Delhi, India
20 Jun 200070.7DiedArchbishop of Delhi, India

MicroData Summary for Alan Basil de Lastic:
Archbishop Alan Basil de Lastic (born , died ) Archbishop of Delhi

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 3 Dec 2014