Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Joseph Cardinal O’Connor

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1920Born
15 Dec 194525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Apr 197959.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
24 Apr 197959.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cursola
27 May 197959.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cursola
6 May 198363.3AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
29 Jun 198363.4InstalledBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jan 198464.0AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
19 Mar 198464.1InstalledArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
25 May 198565.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198565.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
3 May 200080.3DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph O’Connor (VIAF: 4947420)
John Joseph Cardinal O’Connor (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017