Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Justo Mullor García

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Volsinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1932Born
8 Dec 195422.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 197946.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Emerita Augusta
22 Mar 197946.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
2 May 197946.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burkina Faso
27 May 197947.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Emerita Augusta
25 Aug 197947.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Niger
3 May 198552.9AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva
30 Nov 199159.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Estonia
30 Nov 199159.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia
30 Nov 199159.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
15 Apr 199259.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
28 Jul 199462.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volsinium
2 Apr 199764.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México
11 Feb 200067.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
13 Oct 200775.4RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
30 Dec 201684.6DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

MicroData Summary for Justo Mullor García (VIAF: 61354237)
Archbishop Justo Mullor García (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Villares, Spain

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2007
  • d: CB, 30 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017