Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

Archidioecesis Cracoviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stanisław Dziwisz, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Damian Andrzej Muskus, O.F.M., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Grzegorz Ryś, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jan Szkodoń, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jan Zając, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Franciszek Macharski, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 October 1925
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 5,730 (2,213 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diecezja.krakow.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Metropolitalna, ul. Franciszkanska 3, 31-004 Krakow, Polska
  • Telephone: (012)62.88.100
  • Fax: 42.94.617

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Kraków
10th CenturyErectedDiocese of Kraków (erected)
13 June 1805Territory LostDiocese of Kraków Diocese of Kielce (erected)
Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
28 October 1925ElevatedDiocese of Kraków Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Katowice
Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Diocese of Bielsko-Żywiec (erected)
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Częstochowa
Diocese of Kielce
Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Diocese of Sosnowiec (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
19501,200,0001,208,00099.3%5605201,0801,1111,2072,300320ap1951
19691,738,9461,779,42797.7%8946991,5931,0911,3733,043322ap1971
19802,125,0002,332,50091.1%9856491,6341,3001,4792,954331ap1981
19902,200,1502,246,90097.9%1,1857851,9701,1162,1952,994470ap1991
19991,616,8501,657,85397.5%1,0468421,8888561,9082,738390ap2000
20001,615,7851,666,88496.9%1,0548871,9418321,9392,758398ap2001
20011,607,3131,659,09296.9%1,0649071,9718151,8802,689400ap2002
20021,572,2661,634,46596.2%1,0589091,9677991,9092,989409ap2003
20031,562,9041,618,37896.6%1,0669362,0027801,9212,869610ap2004
20041,566,5551,618,59396.8%1,0779492,0267731,9042,937414ap2005
20101,556,0001,601,00097.2%1,1219682,0897441,8282,673439ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Apr 2014