Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacharias Cenita Jimenez

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Butuan

Titular Bishop of Arba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1947 BornInabanga
17 Apr 197325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tagbilaran, Philippines
2 Dec 199447.1AppointedBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
6 Jan 199547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
11 Jun 200355.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Butuan, Philippines
11 Jun 200355.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
7 May 200961.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Butuan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Zacharias Cenita Jimenez:
Bishop Zacharias Cenita Jimenez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Butuan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Butuan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013