Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anicetus Bongsu Antonius Sinaga, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia

Apostolic Administrator of Sibolga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1941Born
13 Dec 196928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Nov 197837.1AppointedPrefect of Sibolga, Indonesia
24 Oct 198039.0AppointedBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia
6 Jan 198139.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia
3 Jan 200462.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Medan, Indonesia
12 Feb 200967.3SucceededArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia
22 Sep 201876.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sibolga, Indonesia
8 Dec 201877.2RetiredArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia
7 Nov 202079.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Medan, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Anicetus Bongsu Antonius Sinaga (VIAF: 44886490)
Archbishop Anicetus Bongsu Antonius Sinaga O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagadolok
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceElisabeth, Hospital, Medan, Archdiocese of Medan

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2018
  • aadm: CB, 10 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 5,012
  • d: CB, 7 Nov 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast