Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isaac Jogues Agbémenya Kodjo Gaglo

Bishop of Aného


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1958 BornKpémé
9 Aug 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lomé, Togo
3 Dec 200749.1AppointedBishop of Aného, Togo
2 Feb 200849.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aného, Togo

MicroData Summary for Isaac Jogues Agbémenya Kodjo Gaglo:
Bishop Isaac Jogues Agbémenya Kodjo Gaglo (born ) Bishop of Aného

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aného.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,670

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015