Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Kimpinde Amando

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1933Born
29 Jun 196228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Mar 198046.6AppointedBishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 May 198046.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 198955.6AppointedBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Sep 201077.0RetiredBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Jan 201783.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Dominique Kimpinde Amando
Bishop Dominique Kimpinde Amando (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalemie-Kirungu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKampinda

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2010
  • d: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2017, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017