Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Lajolo

President Emeritus of the Governatorate of Vatican City State

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1935 BornNovara, Italy
29 Apr 196025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
3 Oct 198853.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesariana
3 Oct 198853.8AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
6 Jan 198954.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesariana
7 Dec 199560.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
7 Oct 200368.8AppointedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State
15 Sep 200671.7AppointedPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
15 Sep 200671.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
24 Nov 200772.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
24 Nov 200772.9Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 200873.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
1 Oct 201176.7RetiredPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
1 Oct 201176.7RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Lajolo:
Cardinal Giovanni Lajolo (born ) President Emeritus of Governatorate of Vatican City State

Please contact the Cardinal through the Governatorate of Vatican City State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,021
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 17 Sep 2013