Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elmo Noel Joseph Perera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galle, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1932Born
21 Dec 196028.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 199260.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
17 Dec 199260.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
6 Jan 199360.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
1 Jun 199562.4AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
11 Oct 200471.8ResignedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
9 Apr 201582.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Galle, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Elmo Noel Joseph Perera
Bishop Elmo Noel Joseph Perera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadampe

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,946
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast