Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Alvaro del Portillo y Diez de Sollano

Deceased

Prelate of Opus Dei

Titular Bishop of Vita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1914Born
25 Jun 194430.2Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
28 Nov 198268.7AppointedPrelate of Opus Dei
7 Dec 199076.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
6 Jan 199176.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vita
23 Mar 199480.0DiedPrelate of Opus Dei
27 Sep 2014Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Alvaro del Portillo y Diez de Sollano
Bishop Bl. Alvaro del Portillo y Diez de Sollano (born , died ) Prelate of Opus Dei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,305
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • beat: CB, 3 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017