Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomislav Koljatic Maroevic

Bishop of Linares, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1955 Born
14 Aug 198731.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
27 Nov 199742.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
27 Nov 199742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
6 Jan 199842.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
17 Jan 200347.3AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
15 Mar 200347.4InstalledBishop of Linares, Chile

MicroData Summary for Tomislav Koljatic Maroevic
Bishop Tomislav Koljatic Maroevic (born ) Bishop of Linares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Linares.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast