Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis George Adeodatus Micallef, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kuwait

Titular Bishop of Tinisa in Proconsulari


from the Official Web Site of the Vicariate

from the Official Web Site of the Vicariate

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1928Born
9 May 195425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
5 Nov 198152.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kuwait
5 Nov 198152.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinisa in Proconsulari
6 Jan 198253.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinisa in Proconsulari
15 Jan 198253.0InstalledVicar Apostolic of Kuwait
14 Jul 200576.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Kuwait
3 Jan 201889.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kuwait

MicroData Summary for Francis George Adeodatus Micallef
Bishop Francis George Adeodatus Micallef O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kuwait

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirkirkara, Malta
Death PlaceBirkirkara, Malta

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2005
  • d: CB, 3 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast