Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Emmanuel Ogbonna Okobo

Bishop Emeritus of Nsukka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1936 BornLejja
4 Jun 196629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Enugu, Nigeria
19 Nov 199054.0AppointedBishop of Nsukka, Nigeria
6 Jan 199154.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nsukka, Nigeria
13 Apr 201376.4RetiredBishop of Nsukka, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Francis Emmanuel Ogbonna Okobo:
Bishop Francis Emmanuel Ogbonna Okobo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nsukka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nsukka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,301
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013