Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Tonucci

Prelate Emeritus of Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1941 Born
19 Mar 196624.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 198947.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Torcello
21 Oct 198947.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
6 Jan 199048.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Torcello
9 Mar 199654.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kenya
1997²55.0AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Environment Program and Human Settlements Program
16 Oct 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sweden
16 Oct 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Denmark
16 Oct 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Finland
16 Oct 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iceland
16 Oct 200462.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Norway
18 Oct 200765.8AppointedPrelate of Loreto, Italy
1 Dec 200765.9InstalledPrelate of Loreto, Italy
20 May 201775.4RetiredPrelate of Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tonucci
Archbishop Giovanni Tonucci (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Territorial Prelature of Loreto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,676
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017