Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Sebastián Laboa Gallego

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Titular Archbishop of Zaraď


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1923BornPasajes de San Juan
16 Apr 194926.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 198259.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zaraď
18 Dec 198259.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
6 Jan 198359.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Zaraď
21 Aug 199067.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
18 Mar 199572.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
18 Mar 199572.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Libya
10 Mar 199774.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Libya
13 Jun 199875.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Malta
13 Jun 199875.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Libya
24 Oct 200279.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

MicroData Summary for José Sebastián Laboa Gallego:
Archbishop José Sebastián Laboa Gallego (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Malta

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015