Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Peter Wypych

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Naraggara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1954 BornKazimierza Wielka, Poland
6 May 197823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Krakˇw {Cracow}, Poland
29 Apr 197924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Krakˇw {Cracow}, Poland
1 Sep 198934.7IncardinatedPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
13 Jun 201156.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
13 Jun 201156.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Naraggara
10 Aug 201156.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naraggara

MicroData Summary for Andrew Peter Wypych:
Bishop Andrew Peter Wypych (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,125
  • od/c0: CB, 18 Apr 2014
  • od: CB, 21 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Apr 2014