Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Maria Erba, B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Velletri-Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1930Born
8 Sep 194818.6ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
7 Oct 195424.7Solemn VowsMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
17 Dec 195525.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
17 Mar 195626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
19 Dec 198858.9AppointedBishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy
6 Jan 198959.0Ordained BishopBishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy
22 Jan 198959.0InstalledBishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy
28 Jan 200676.0RetiredBishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy
21 May 201686.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Velletri-Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Maria Erba (VIAF: 7238401)
Bishop Andrea Maria Erba B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Velletri-Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiassono

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,033
  • d: CB, 22 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018