Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gilberto Cardinal Agustoni

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Urbano e Lorenzo a Prima Porta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1922Born
20 Apr 194623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
18 Dec 198664.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caprulae
18 Dec 198664.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
6 Jan 198764.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caprulae
2 Apr 199269.6AppointedPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura
26 Nov 199472.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Urbano e Lorenzo a Prima Porta
26 Nov 199472.3AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
26 Nov 199472.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 199876.1RetiredPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
24 Feb 200582.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Urbano e Lorenzo a Prima Porta
13 Jan 201794.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Agustoni (VIAF: 309724594)
Gilberto Cardinal Agustoni (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchaffhausen, Diocese of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
Ordained PriestLugano, Diocese of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
  • a cardinal for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017