Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Louis Pierre Cardinal Tauran

President of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1943 BornBordeaux, France
20 Sep 196926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
1 Dec 199047.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thelepte
1 Dec 199047.6AppointedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State
6 Jan 199147.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thelepte
6 Oct 200360.5ResignedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State
21 Oct 200360.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
21 Oct 200360.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200360.6AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
24 Nov 200360.6AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
14 Dec 200360.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
25 Jun 200764.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
1 Sep 200764.4InstalledPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
28 Feb 201369.8CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
16 Mar 201369.9ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue
12 Jun 201471.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
20 Dec 201471.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Pierre Tauran:
Jean-Louis Pierre Cardinal Tauran (born ) President of Interreligious Dialogue

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Interreligious Dialogue.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,295
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014