Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Nicolini

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1926BornSan Vigilio di Concesio
29 Mar 195225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
16 Jul 198761.0AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
5 Sep 198761.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
16 Feb 199366.6AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
19 Jun 200174.9DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Nicolini:
Bishop Giulio Nicolini (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,156
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013