Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Hanna Shaleta (Challita)

Bishop of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1956 Born
31 May 198427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA
15 Jan 201558.1AppointedBishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada
6 Feb 201558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada
9 Aug 201760.7AppointedBishop of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean), USA

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Hanna Shaleta (Challita)
Bishop Emmanuel Hanna Shaleta (Challita) (born ) Bishop of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFishkabour-Zakho, Iraq
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Baghdad

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Jan 2015
  • c34: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,362
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Aug 2017