Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien Mawule Kouto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Atakpamé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1946BornLomé
29 Jun 197529.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 199347.3AppointedBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
6 Jan 199447.5Ordained BishopBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
1 Mar 200659.7ResignedBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
5 Jun 201568.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Atakpamé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Julien Mawule Kouto:
Bishop Julien Mawule Kouto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Atakpamé

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,188
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: CB, 8 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 9 Jun 2015