Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Protase Cardinal Rugambwa

Archbishop of Tabora, Tanzania

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Montesanto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1960 Born
2 Sep 199030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rulenge, Tanzania
18 Jan 200847.6AppointedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
13 Apr 200847.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
26 Jun 201252.0AppointedAdjunct Secretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
26 Jun 201252.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
9 Nov 201757.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
15 Mar 202362.7CeasedSecretary of the Dicastery for Evangelization
13 Apr 202362.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
30 Sep 202363.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Montesanto
30 Sep 202363.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 202363.4SucceededArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
18 Feb 202463.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Montesanto

MicroData Summary for Protase Rugambwa
(VIAF: 316740267; WikiData: Q552752)
Protase Cardinal Rugambwa (born ) Archbishop of Tabora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBunena
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Victory, Cathedral, Kigoma, Diocese of Kigoma

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Tabora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,727
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2023
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • cpri: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023
  • s: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2023
  • i: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 12 Feb 2024