Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Regmunt

Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1951 BornKrasnystaw
29 May 197624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
3 Dec 199443.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Legnica, Poland
3 Dec 199443.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
6 Jan 199543.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
29 Dec 200756.5AppointedBishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Regmunt:
Bishop Stefan Regmunt (born ) Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zielona Góra-Gorzów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,465

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013