Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rino Passigato

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Nova Caesaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1944 BornBovolone, Italy
29 Jun 196824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
16 Dec 199147.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nova Caesaris
16 Dec 199147.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burundi
6 Jan 199247.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nova Caesaris
18 Mar 199652.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
17 Jul 199955.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
8 Nov 200864.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Rino Passigato:
Archbishop Rino Passigato (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Portugal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,554
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 28 Oct 2014