Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marc Cardinal Ouellet, P.S.S.

Prefect of the Congregation for Bishops

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina

President of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1944 BornLamotte, Canada
25 May 196824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
3 Mar 200156.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
3 Mar 200156.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Acropolis
19 Mar 200156.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Acropolis
15 Nov 200258.4AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
26 Jan 200358.6InstalledArchbishop of Québec, Canada
21 Oct 200359.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200359.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
30 Jun 201066.1ResignedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
30 Jun 201066.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
30 Jun 201066.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America
28 Feb 201368.7CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
16 Mar 201368.8ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops

MicroData Summary for Marc Ouellet:
Marc Cardinal Ouellet P.S.S. (born ) Prefect of Bishops

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Bishops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,940
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jun 2014