Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin David de Jesus, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Jolo

Titular Bishop of Bladia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1940BornHullong
29 Dec 196727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Oct 199151.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
11 Oct 199151.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
6 Jan 199251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
15 Feb 199251.5InstalledVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
4 Feb 199756.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Benjamin David de Jesus:
Bishop Benjamin David de Jesus O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Jolo

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,559
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 23 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 24 Jul 2015