Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Kweku Sam

Deceased

Bishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1940Born
23 Jul 196727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
30 Nov 198141.8AppointedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
6 Jan 198241.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
20 Feb 198242.0InstalledBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
13 Jan 199857.9DiedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Charles Kweku Sam
Bishop Charles Kweku Sam (born , died ) Bishop of Sekondi-Takoradi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmuni

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast