Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Muhiirwa

Bishop of Fort Portal, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1958 Born
11 Aug 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Portal, Uganda
18 Mar 200344.4AppointedBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
15 Jun 200344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Robert Muhiirwa
Bishop Robert Muhiirwa (born ) Bishop of Fort Portal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbonde

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fort Portal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018