Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Romeo

Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Odigitria dei Siciliani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1938 BornAcireale, Italy
18 Mar 196123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
17 Dec 198345.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vulturia
17 Dec 198345.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
6 Jan 198445.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vulturia
24 Apr 199052.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
5 Feb 199960.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Canada
17 Apr 200163.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
17 Apr 200163.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to San Marino
19 Dec 200668.8AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
10 Feb 200768.9InstalledArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
20 Nov 201072.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201072.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Odigitria dei Siciliani
22 Jan 201172.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Odigitria dei Siciliani
8 Apr 201375.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
28 Jun 201577.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
27 Oct 201577.6RetiredArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Romeo
Paolo Cardinal Romeo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Palermo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016