Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Salina, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice

Titular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1926BornMorges, Switzerland
5 Sep 195326.7ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
15 Sep 195932.8Ordained PriestPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
15 Jul 197043.6SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
25 Aug 197043.7ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
21 Dec 199165.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
6 Jan 199265.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
25 Feb 199972.2ResignedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
3 Dec 200781.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Henri Salina:
Bishop Henri Salina C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,563
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014