Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro López Quintana

Apostolic Nuncio to Lithuania

Titular Archbishop of Acropolis

Apostolic Nuncio to Estonia

Apostolic Nuncio to Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1953 BornBarbastro, Spain
15 Jun 198026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Dec 200249.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Acropolis
6 Jan 200349.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Acropolis
8 Feb 200349.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to India
8 Feb 200349.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nepal
10 Dec 200956.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Canada
28 Sep 201360.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Canada
8 Mar 201460.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
22 Mar 201460.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Estonia
22 Mar 201460.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia

MicroData Summary for Pedro López Quintana:
Archbishop Pedro López Quintana (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Lithuania

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Lithuania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,303
  • r: CB, 24 Sep 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014