Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Franšois Marie Joseph Duprey, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity

Titular Bishop of Thibaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1922BornCroix, France
1 Feb 195027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
25 Apr 198360.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
12 Dec 198967.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibaris
6 Jan 199067.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibaris
16 Mar 199976.3RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
13 May 200784.5DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity

MicroData Summary for Pierre Franšois Marie Joseph Duprey:
Bishop Pierre Franšois Marie Joseph Duprey M. Afr. (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Promoting Christian Unity

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,684
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Nov 2013