Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Argemiro de Azevedo, C.M.F.

Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1952 Born
9 Feb 197522.1ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
2 Jul 198027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Dec 201664.0AppointedBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Feb 201764.2Ordained BishopBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 201764.2InstalledBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Argemiro de Azevedo
Bishop Argemiro de Azevedo C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Assis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFernandópolis, Diocese of Jales, Sao Paulo
Ordained PriestEstadio do Maracanã, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes Dr. Plácido Rocha, Araçatuba, Diocese of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Assis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,340
  • c1: CB, 2 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jul 2020

Quantcast