Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Ignacio Cardinal Velasco Garcia, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Domenica Mazzarello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1929BornAcarigua
17 Dec 195526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Oct 198960.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela
23 Oct 198960.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimmira
6 Jan 199061.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimmira
27 Jan 199061.0InstalledVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela
27 May 199566.4AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
14 Jul 199566.5InstalledArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
21 Feb 200172.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200172.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Domenica Mazzarello
6 Jul 200374.5DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ignacio Velasco Garcia:
Cardinal Antonio Ignacio Velasco Garcia S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,681
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013