Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Milano

Bishop Emeritus of Aversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1936 BornLamezia Terme
3 Jul 196024.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 198953.6AppointedArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
6 Jan 199053.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
28 Feb 199861.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Aversa, Italy
4 Apr 199861.9InstalledBishop of Aversa, Italy
15 Jan 201174.7ResignedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Milano:
Archbishop Mario Milano (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aversa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Aversa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,678

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013