Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaroslav Škarvada

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Litomyšl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1924BornPraha
12 Mar 194924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Dec 198258.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Dec 198258.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Litomyšl
6 Jan 198358.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Litomyšl
25 Sep 200278.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 Jun 201085.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jaroslav Škarvada:
Bishop Jaroslav Škarvada (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 1 Mar 2014