Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Kombo, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Owando


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1941BornPointe-Noire
8 Jul 197332.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Dec 198342.6AppointedBishop of Nkayi, Congo
6 Jan 198442.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nkayi, Congo
7 Jul 199049.2AppointedBishop of Owando, Congo
22 Oct 200867.5DiedBishop of Owando, Congo

MicroData Summary for Ernest Kombo:
Bishop Ernest Kombo S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Owando

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015